THE CARNE TRUST

Charity number: 1115903
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £372.31k £219.07k £625.99k £412.70k £420.82k
Total expenditure £508.89k £334.97k £538.02k £754.22k £465.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £610.98k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £610.98k N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £15.01k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £530.72k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £7.30k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £9.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £521.72k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £7.30k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A