Trustees BRIDGE STREET PENTECOSTAL CHURCH
Charity number: 1115680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CRAIG CECIL INWOOD | Chair | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Divya Prakash Bohorun | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine June Roberts | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Olowosuka | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr OLORUNDA ROTIMI | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr REBECCA AHERINA KATUNDU LASSEKO | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR ONENE OSAROJIRE OSAROLLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN JOHN JARVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.