CATALYST TAVISTOCK

Charity number: 1118950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £37.84k £46.83k £43.00k £49.77k £40.66k
Total expenditure £42.08k £45.37k £46.83k £45.37k £36.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A