NORTH EAST SUFFOLK CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1115522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £340.47k £294.20k £304.72k £343.01k £392.95k
Total expenditure £380.16k £322.10k £341.13k £346.75k £355.89k
Income from government contracts £84.80k £11.24k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £153.44k £177.51k £212.53k £224.10k £240.13k