ST SWITHUNS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1117697
Charity reporting is overdue by 757 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £8.11k £6.48k £5.91k £3.17k £2.45k
Total expenditure £5.44k £4.58k £5.91k £2.76k £955
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A