Financial history HOPE 08 LTD

Charity number: 1116005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £472.97k £363.47k £270.42k £330.31k £344.99k
Total expenditure £226.95k £399.57k £240.48k £316.62k £348.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A