Financial history SICK! PRODUCTIONS LTD.

Charity number: 1116008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £335.63k £447.36k £499.37k £432.99k £404.65k
Total expenditure £478.76k £273.24k £546.12k £323.81k £417.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £146.00k N/A N/A £275.10k £254.09k