Trustees THE NORTH LONDON COLLEGIATE SCHOOL
Charity number: 1115843

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Charles Anthony Hingley | Chair | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Nina Arleen Kingsmill Moore | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Lisa Kruger Gower | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Nicholas Thomas | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ameet Jogia | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andreas Ernst Ferdinand Utermann | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Harding | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thivi Maruthappu | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Judith Sophia Watford | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Jane Marten | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Shumailla Zareen Dar | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adrian Weller | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Vivien Godfrey | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Herdman-Smith | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dorothy Toh | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID NEEDLEMAN | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Brian Young | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE DAVIS BA,DIP | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE CARTER | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.