Accounts and annual returns VISION INDIA

Charity number: 1116412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 October 2021 01 October 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 16 October 2020 23 March 2022 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 16 October 2019 28 March 2021 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 16 October 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 16 October 2017 21 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2017 Not Required