KELLY TRUST (CREDITON)

Charity number: 1116644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £34.76k £35.25k £42.99k £36.79k £35.93k
Total expenditure £25.05k £26.82k £16.19k £19.35k £74.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A