ADAM OUTREACH PROJECT

Charity number: 1117871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £132.80k £128.91k £135.35k £148.23k £153.63k
Total expenditure £120.00k £110.49k £106.56k £133.72k £143.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A