GARDEN ROUTE CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1116278
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £54.69k £52.92k £60.58k £117.44k £67.23k
Total expenditure £56.18k £55.16k £50.44k £48.58k £50.09k