THE GREESTONE TRUST

Charity number: 1118244
Charity reporting is overdue by 501 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 501 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 501 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 July 2019 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 April 2018 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 June 2017 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required