Financial history BOBI WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1117420
Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £5.50k £7.22k £5.42k £9.99k £1.51k
Total expenditure £6.02k £10.18k £5.39k £5.19k £1.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A