Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S GRITTLETON

Charity number: 1116144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 September 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required