ST JOSEPH'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY

Charity number: 1116185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £13.60k £8.53k £9.74k £9.45k £4.66k
Total expenditure £19.10k £3.64k £4.08k £3.73k £23.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A