Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF PRESCOT TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1116250
Charity reporting is overdue by 363 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 363 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 363 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 202 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 06 June 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 09 February 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window