Financial history LONDON TRANSPORT MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1123122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.21m £14.04m £15.95m £11.69m £15.41m
Total expenditure £15.46m £15.91m £16.06m £12.73m £14.52m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.15m
Income from government grants N/A £3.14m £3.13m £2.60m £3.36m
Income - Donations and legacies £5.01m £4.02m £4.16m £7.79m £6.59m
Income - Other trading activities £4.28m £4.45m £4.60m £2.69m £4.41m
Income - Charitable activities £4.82m £5.07m £6.45m £1.20m £4.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.00k £15.00k £56.00k £10.00k £2.00k
Income - Other £94.00k £497.00k £687.00k £11.00k £2.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £50.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.32m £11.69m £11.61m £8.98m £9.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.14m £4.22m £4.45m £3.75m £4.60m
Expenditure - Governance £74.00k £0 £44.00k £30.00k £61.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0