Accounts and annual returns YESHIVAS AHAVAS TORAH

Charity number: 1117332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 February 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 April 2019 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required