Financial history THE JOHN ROBINSON YOUTH CHESS TRUST

Charity number: 1116981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £26.64k £27.20k £28.75k £26.56k £173.59k
Total expenditure £30.36k £32.44k £28.27k £9.00k £28.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A