ST GEORGES POP-IN

Charity number: 1120538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £17.00k £14.42k £11.00k £13.99k £12.15k
Total expenditure £16.00k £16.68k £12.00k £15.26k £12.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.36k £0 N/A N/A N/A