NO SIZE FITS ALL PRODUCTIONS LIMITED

Charity number: 1117029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time Download