SCHOOL CONNECT

Charity number: 1119269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £6.56k £2.35k £1.44k £2.00k £2.03k
Total expenditure £4.59k £1.30k £1.61k £1.17k £4.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A