Trustees BEARWOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natalie Pilcher Chair 12 May 2022
None on record
Jenna Milton Trustee 03 January 2023
None on record
Lesley Scotter Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Anne Moira Clark Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Gary Mason Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Sophie Ireland Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Stephen Ireland Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
CELIA MITCHENER Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record
LESLIE JOHN FOUNTAIN Trustee 11 April 2007
None on record