Financial history LIVABILITY

Charity number: 1116530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £50.33m £46.18m £47.93m £44.28m £46.14m
Total expenditure £53.00m £48.06m £52.89m £47.02m £48.43m
Income from government contracts £41.81m £37.58m £29.29m £40.02m £2.56m
Income from government grants £99.00k N/A N/A £67.65k £2.56m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.10m £4.89m £5.14m £4.03m £6.56m
Income - Other trading activities £53.00k £1.55m £45.00k £161.00k £532.00k
Income - Charitable activities £41.92m £39.69m £42.18m £40.02m £38.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £156.00k £58.00k £79.00k £65.00k £55.00k
Income - Other £4.10m £0 £488.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.74m £2.45m £2.91m £1.56m £100.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £51.20m £45.57m £47.78m £44.68m £46.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.25m £1.44m £1.42m £1.28m £997.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £125.00k £51.00k £89.00k £119.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £547.00k £1.05m £3.69m £1.06m £1.02m