Accounts and annual returns LONDON COLLEGE OF BUSINESS STUDIES

Charity number: 1117883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 February 2016 08 December 2016 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2016 19 May 2017 163 days late Download Open in new window