THE FOUNDATION OF THE COLLEGE OF ST GEORGE WINDSOR CASTLE

Charity number: 1118295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 05 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 June 2017 On time Download