Financial history GREEN ECONOMICS INSTITUTE TRUST

Charity number: 1117638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £13.11k £16.60k £11.16k £9.94k £5.87k
Total expenditure £14.21k £14.33k £11.54k £6.02k £5.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A