DAR AL-HUDA

Charity number: 1121477
Charity reporting is overdue by 120 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £9.46k £8.97k £8.76k £9.77k £8.90k
Total expenditure £9.20k £8.74k £8.24k £8.65k £8.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A