HUDDERSFIELD GIANTS COMMUNITY TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1117768
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 January 2021 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 January 2021 87 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2015 07 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 07 September 2016 On time Download