HUDDERSFIELD GIANTS COMMUNITY TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1117768
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/11/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.56m £1.85m £1.73m £1.83m £1.93m
Total expenditure £1.47m £1.76m £1.67m £1.85m £2.03m
Income from government contracts £59.43k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £260.59k £209.84k £184.05k £187.50k £221.76k
Income - Other trading activities £195.87k £218.88k £194.82k £222.08k £241.98k
Income - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.42m £1.35m £1.42m £1.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £184.05k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.23m £1.53m £1.49m £1.64m £1.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £231.09k £182.23k £205.24k £219.06k
Expenditure - Governance £13.90k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0