Financial history PARA DANCE UK

Charity number: 1116988
Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £142.18k £143.70k £277.30k £246.37k £91.62k
Total expenditure £128.32k £148.42k £107.74k £178.05k £264.14k
Income from government contracts N/A £3.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £49.25k N/A