Accounts and annual returns DERMOT GOGARTY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1118617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 April 2021 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 April 2021 526 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 April 2021 891 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required