THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OF THE INTERCESSION OF THE HOLY VIRGIN

Charity number: 1118331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 13/09/2016 13/09/2017 13/09/2018 13/09/2019 13/09/2020
Total gross income £28.12k £29.84k £27.97k £30.13k £22.15k
Total expenditure £21.94k £29.77k £20.52k £15.63k £15.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A