INTEGRATION, TRAINING AND ENTERPRISE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1118586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £8.97k £9.20k £7.53k £7.90k £7.25k
Total expenditure £8.47k £8.75k £6.95k £7.50k £6.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A