Financial history SALISBURY TRUST FOR THE HOMELESS LTD

Charity number: 1118746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £259.50k £280.09k £249.09k £283.06k £275.83k
Total expenditure £218.64k £181.19k £222.31k £219.16k £226.43k
Income from government contracts £31.73k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £3.00k £4.08k £1.13k N/A