Trustees SALISBURY TRUST FOR THE HOMELESS LTD
Charity number: 1118746

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Thornton | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel McMillan | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Phillimore | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
William Bennett | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Maureen Pardy | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ANN ROSEMARY UNDERWOOD | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Edward Cleasby Probert MA, BA | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.