THE RUFFORD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 16 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 25 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 10 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 10 November 2016 On time Download