Trustees ROYAL INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION
Charity number: 1117254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cynthia Robinson OBE | Chair | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Brown MRIN | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ramsey Faragher FRIN | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Terry Moore FRIN | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Linsdall FRIN | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Southall FRIN | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Washington Ochieng FRIN | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Taylor OBE | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gaskin FRIN, FNI | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR Alan Grant FRIN | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phil Butlin | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR Paul Hanna AFRIN | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kate Jeffery FRIN | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Foulger | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Bransby FRIN CEng | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colette Jeffrey | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.