F PIPER WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1117286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 August 2020 18 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2019 18 March 2021 284 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2016 07 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2016 Not Required