F PIPER WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1117286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 07/08/2016 07/08/2017 07/08/2018 07/08/2019 07/08/2020
Total gross income £5.23k £5.30k £4.01k £4.70k £5.33k
Total expenditure £4.88k £4.83k £4.81k £4.59k £5.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A