WAKEFIELD TRINITY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1119077
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 21 December 2017 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 December 2017 174 days late Download