Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, RECULVER

Charity number: 1117389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £6.11k £8.42k £364 £227 £1.30k
Total expenditure £1.30k £692 £464 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A