RIANA DEVELOPMENT NETWORK (RDN)

Charity number: 1119733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 21 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 21 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 05 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 07 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 07 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 08 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 28 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 28 July 2017 On time Download