ACTS TRUST

Charity number: 1119911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 09 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 01 August 2017 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 01 August 2017 32 days late Download