CROSS & COCKADE INTERNATIONAL, THE FIRST WORLD WAR AVIATION HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1117741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £41.96k £42.62k £42.27k £39.66k £42.53k
Total expenditure £34.37k £34.23k £32.89k £36.46k £36.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A