G SCHOENINGH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1119543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £813 £0 £0
Total expenditure £327.89k £231.54k £575.62k £407.07k £420.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A