BEAMINSTER COMMUNITY CENTRE PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1117907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required