BEAMINSTER COMMUNITY CENTRE PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1117907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £7.25k £9.67k £7.74k £8.84k £4.61k
Total expenditure £15.26k £15.88k £16.82k £14.75k £13.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A