Trustees THE CLWYD SPECIAL RIDING CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1118241
Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN REYNOLDS | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Greenwell | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA ROBERTS | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norma Helen Shaw | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Mary Cowley | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Hill-Trevor | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|||||
VICTORIA ANNE EVERALL | Trustee | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JILL DOROTHY WALTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUGH MAURICE LYALL-COTTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN PHILIP GLYN EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.